House
|
07/06/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2021
|
Public Act 21-120
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
File Number 776
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 535
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9545
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
File Number 550
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
House Calendar Number 394
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/22
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|