House | 04/22/2021 | File Number 581 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | House Calendar Number 408 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Public Hearing 03/24 | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |