Senate | 06/08/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 572 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/07/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | File Number 511 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | House Calendar Number 378 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Public Hearing 03/29 | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |