17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | AN ACT CONCERNING HE ALTHY HOMES. |
---|
21 | 21 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
22 | 22 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | Section 1. Section 8-446 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 |
---|
25 | 25 | | following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2021): 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | (a) There is established an account to be known as the "Healthy 3 |
---|
27 | 27 | | Homes Fund" which shall be a separate, nonlapsing account within the 4 |
---|
28 | 28 | | General Fund. The account shall contain any moneys required by law to 5 |
---|
29 | 29 | | be deposited in the account. Moneys in the account shall be expended 6 |
---|
30 | 30 | | by the Department of Housing for the purposes of: 7 |
---|
31 | 31 | | (1) Funding of not more than one million dollars, from remittances 8 |
---|
32 | 32 | | transferred pursuant to section 38a-331 for the period beginning January 9 |
---|
33 | 33 | | 1, 2019, and ending December 31, 2019, shall be remitted to the 10 |
---|
34 | 34 | | Department of Economic and Community Development to be used for 11 |
---|
35 | 35 | | grants-in-aid to homeowners with homes located in the immediate 12 |
---|
36 | 36 | | vicinity of the West River in the Westville section of New Haven and 13 |
---|
37 | 37 | | Woodbridge for structurally damaged homes due to subsidence and to 14 |
---|
38 | 38 | | homeowners with homes abutting the Yale Golf Course in the Westville 15 Raised Bill No. 6653 |
---|
39 | 39 | | |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
44 | 43 | | |
---|
45 | 44 | | section of New Haven for damage to such homes from water infiltration 16 |
---|
46 | 45 | | or structural damage due to subsidence; and 17 |
---|
47 | 46 | | (2) Funding a program, and any related administrative expense, to 18 |
---|
48 | 47 | | reduce health and safety hazards in residential dwellings in 19 |
---|
49 | 48 | | Connecticut, including, but not limited to, lead, radon and other 20 |
---|
50 | 49 | | contaminants or conditions, through removal, remediation, abatement 21 |
---|
51 | 50 | | and other appropriate methods. For purposes of this subdivision, 22 |
---|
52 | 51 | | "administrative expense" means any administrative or other cost or 23 |
---|
53 | 52 | | expense incurred by the Department of Housing in carrying out the 24 |
---|
54 | 53 | | provisions of this [section] subdivision, including, but not limited to, the 25 |
---|
55 | 54 | | hiring of necessary employees and entering into necessary contracts; 26 |
---|
56 | 55 | | and 27 |
---|
57 | 56 | | (3) Funding the pilot program established pursuant to section 2 of 28 |
---|
58 | 57 | | this act. 29 |
---|
59 | 58 | | (b) The Department of Housing shall notify the Department of Public 30 |
---|
60 | 59 | | Health not later than thirty days after the deposit of remittances in the 31 |
---|
61 | 60 | | Healthy Homes Fund pursuant to subdivision (2) of subsection (c) of 32 |
---|
62 | 61 | | section 38a-331. Not later than thirty days after the deposit of 33 |
---|
63 | 62 | | remittances pursuant to subdivision (2) of subsection (c) of section 38a-34 |
---|
64 | 63 | | 331, the Department of Public Health shall notify each municipal health 35 |
---|
65 | 64 | | department in the state annually regarding funds available pursuant to 36 |
---|
66 | 65 | | the Healthy Homes Fund established pursuant to subsection (a) of this 37 |
---|
67 | 66 | | section. 38 |
---|
68 | 67 | | (c) Not later than January 1, 2020, and annually thereafter, the 39 |
---|
69 | 68 | | Commissioner of Housing shall report to the joint standing committees 40 |
---|
70 | 69 | | of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to 41 |
---|
71 | 70 | | housing, planning and development and appropriations and the 42 |
---|
72 | 71 | | budgets of state agencies, in accordance with section 11-4a, regarding 43 |
---|
73 | 72 | | the status of the Healthy Homes Fund established pursuant to this 44 |
---|
74 | 73 | | section and all moneys deposited into and expended by the Department 45 |
---|
75 | 74 | | of Housing pursuant to said account. Any such report may be submitted 46 |
---|
76 | 75 | | electronically. 47 Raised Bill No. 6653 |
---|
77 | 76 | | |
---|
78 | 77 | | |
---|
82 | 80 | | |
---|
83 | 81 | | Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2021) (a) On or before January 1, 48 |
---|
84 | 82 | | 2022, the Department of Housing shall establish a pilot program to 49 |
---|
85 | 83 | | annually provide not less than five hundred residential dwellings with 50 |
---|
86 | 84 | | (1) energy efficiency retrofits, including, but not limited to, retrofitting 51 |
---|
87 | 85 | | of existing heating, ventilation or air conditioning systems, and (2) 52 |
---|
88 | 86 | | residential improvements that reduce health and safety hazards found 53 |
---|
89 | 87 | | in such residential dwellings, including, but not limited to, lead, radon 54 |
---|
90 | 88 | | and other contaminants, through removal, remediation and abatement 55 |
---|
91 | 89 | | of such health and safety hazards. The energy efficiency retrofits shall 56 |
---|
92 | 90 | | be consistent with the guidelines set forth in the Conservation and Load 57 |
---|
93 | 91 | | Management Plan submitted by the electric distribution companies, as 58 |
---|
94 | 92 | | defined in section 16-1 of the general statutes, in coordination with the 59 |
---|
95 | 93 | | gas companies, as defined in said section, to the Energy Conservation 60 |
---|
96 | 94 | | Management Board pursuant to section 16-245m of the general statutes. 61 |
---|
97 | 95 | | The pilot program shall be funded in accordance with the provisions of 62 |
---|
98 | 96 | | subsection (c) of this section and terminate on December 31, 2031. 63 |
---|
99 | 97 | | (b) The Commissioner of Housing may contract with nonprofit 64 |
---|
100 | 98 | | organizations to employ in-home environmental assessors to perform 65 |
---|
101 | 99 | | energy efficiency retrofits and residential improvements that reduce 66 |
---|
102 | 100 | | health and safety hazards pursuant to subsection (a) of this section. In 67 |
---|
103 | 101 | | order to qualify for employment as an in-home environmental assessor, 68 |
---|
104 | 102 | | a person shall (1) for energy efficient retrofits, (A) be certified to perform 69 |
---|
105 | 103 | | energy efficiency retrofits by a nationally recognized certifying 70 |
---|
106 | 104 | | organization, or (B) have earned a certificate in energy efficiency 71 |
---|
107 | 105 | | retrofits, in-home environmental assessments or a related field from an 72 |
---|
108 | 106 | | accredited institution of higher education, or (2) for residential 73 |
---|
109 | 107 | | improvements that reduce health and safety hazards, (A) be certified to 74 |
---|
110 | 108 | | remove, remediate or abate health and safety hazards by a nationally 75 |
---|
111 | 109 | | recognized certifying organization, or (B) have earned a certificate in the 76 |
---|
112 | 110 | | removal, remediation or abatement of health and safety hazards or a 77 |
---|
113 | 111 | | related field from an accredited institution of higher education. 78 |
---|
114 | 112 | | (c) In accordance with the provisions of section 8-446 of the general 79 |
---|
123 | 120 | | annually for the purposes of the pilot program established pursuant to 82 |
---|
124 | 121 | | this section and any related administrative expense. For purposes of this 83 |
---|
125 | 122 | | subsection, "administrative expense" means any administrative or other 84 |
---|
126 | 123 | | cost or expense incurred by the Department of Housing in carrying out 85 |
---|
127 | 124 | | the provisions of this section, including, but not limited to, the hiring of 86 |
---|
128 | 125 | | necessary employees and entering into necessary contracts. 87 |
---|
129 | 126 | | (d) Not later than January 1, 2023, and annually thereafter until 88 |
---|
130 | 127 | | December 31, 2031, the Commissioner of Housing shall report, in 89 |
---|
131 | 128 | | accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 90 |
---|
132 | 129 | | to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having 91 |
---|
133 | 130 | | cognizance of matters relating to housing, energy and technology, 92 |
---|
134 | 131 | | planning and development and the budgets of state agencies regarding 93 |
---|
135 | 132 | | the status of the pilot program established pursuant to subsection (a) of 94 |
---|
136 | 133 | | this section and all moneys expended by the Department of Housing for 95 |
---|
137 | 134 | | the purposes of carrying out the provisions of this section. 96 |
---|
138 | 135 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
139 | 136 | | sections: |
---|
140 | 137 | | |
---|
141 | 138 | | Section 1 October 1, 2021 8-446 |
---|
142 | 139 | | Sec. 2 October 1, 2021 New section |
---|
143 | 140 | | |
---|