Senate | 06/24/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/16/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/16/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/15/2021 | Public Act 21-74 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2021 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/04/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 540 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/01/2021 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 06/01/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | File Number 416 | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | House Calendar Number 317 | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Public Hearing 03/24 | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |