House
|
06/30/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
Public Act 21-103
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
File Number 694
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 433
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8397
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8465
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
File Number 479
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
House Calendar Number 349
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/24
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|