Senate | 07/13/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/24/2021 | Special Act 21-19 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 06/06/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 563 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/05/2021 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/05/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
House | 06/05/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | File Number 738 | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | House Calendar Number 549 | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/21/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/26/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Public Hearing 05/14 | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |