House | 05/27/2021 | File Number 739 | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | House Calendar Number 550 | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/21/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/26/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Public Hearing 05/14 | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |