House | 06/01/2021 | File Number 764 | ||
House | 06/01/2021 | House Calendar Number 574 | ||
House | 06/01/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 06/01/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 06/01/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Public Hearing 05/14 | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |