Senate | 05/19/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/18/2021 | Special Act 21-4 | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Signed by Governor in Original | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Emergency Certification |