House | 06/16/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | Adopted, Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 381 | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | File Number 417 | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | House Calendar Number 318 | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Vote to Draft |