House | 05/14/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Adopted, Senate | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 361 | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | File Number 105 | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | House Calendar Number 115 | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |