Senate | 05/12/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 25 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | House Calendar Number 35 | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Public Hearing 02/04 |