House | 04/26/2021 | File Number 602 | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | House Calendar Number 425 | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Public Hearing 03/26 | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |