House | 04/26/2021 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | File Number 552 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | House Calendar Number 397 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | House Favorable | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Public Hearing 04/15 | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Filed with House Clerks 03/30 |