House | 06/01/2021 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 05/25/2021 | File Number 719 | ||
House | 05/25/2021 | House Calendar Number 548 | ||
House | 05/25/2021 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/25/2021 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/25/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/24/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/17/2021 | House Favorable | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Public Hearing 05/17 | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Filed with House Clerks 05/06 |