Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Public Act 21-46
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 9762
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 9720
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
House Calendar Number 454
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 7955
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7262
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8095
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
File Number 246
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 175
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|