Senate | 05/12/2021 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | File Number 482 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 296 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Public Hearing 02/08 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |