Senate | 04/28/2021 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | File Number 274 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 196 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/05/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Vote to Draft |