Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00120 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Bill January 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 14, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021