Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00122 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2021

                     
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00122-R02-
SB.docx  
1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 122  
January Session, 2021 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A UNIT WITHIN THE DIVISION OF STATE 
POLICE TO INVESTIGATE HATE CRIMES AND CRIMINAL ACTS 
COMMITTED BY EXTREMI ST GROUPS.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (d) of section 29-4 of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2 
2021): 3 
(d) The commissioner shall establish such divisions as the 4 
commissioner deems necessary for effective operation of the state police 5 
force and consistent with budgetary allotments, a Criminal Intelligence 6 
Division, a Hate Crimes and Extremist Group Investigative Unit and a 7 
state-wide organized crime investigative task force to be engaged 8 
throughout the state for the purpose of preventing and detecting any 9 
violation of the criminal law. The head of the Criminal Intelligence 10 
Division shall be of the rank of sergeant or above. The head of the Hate 11 
Crimes and Extremist Group Investigative Unit shall be the rank of 12 
sergeant or above and shall serve, or appoint a designee to serve, as a 13 
liaison to the State-Wide Hate Crimes Advisory Council, established 14 
under section 51-279f. The head of the state-wide organized crime 15 
investigative task force shall be a police officer. 16 
Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) For the purposes of this 17  Substitute Bill No. 122 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00122-
R02-SB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
section, (1) "extremist" means an individual encouraging, condoning, 18 
justifying or supporting the commission or attempted commission of a 19 
violent crime, or a crime that is intended to cause physical harm to 20 
another person or property damage, to achieve a political, ideological, 21 
religious, social or economic goal, (2) "extremist group" means a group 22 
of extremists associated in fact but not a legal entity, and (3) "law 23 
enforcement unit" has the same meaning as provided in section 7-294a 24 
of the general statutes. 25 
(b) The Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection 26 
shall assign to the Hate Crimes and Extremist Group Investigative Unit, 27 
established under subsection (d) of section 29-4 of the general statutes, 28 
as amended by this act, such personnel as may be required to fulfill the 29 
duties of this section. The unit shall:  30 
(1) Prevent, investigate, detect and assist any law enforcement unit 31 
with the investigation of (A) any alleged crime that is a violation of 32 
section 53a-181j, 53a-181k or 53a-181l of the general statutes, (B) any 33 
other alleged crime that may be motivated by bigotry or bias as a result 34 
of the actual or perceived race, religion, ethnicity, disability, sex, sexual 35 
orientation or gender identity or expression of another person, and (C) 36 
any criminal activity or suspected criminal activity by an extremist or 37 
extremist group; and 38 
(2) Compile, maintain and analyze data regarding (A) crimes that are 39 
violations of section 53a-181j, 53a-181k or 53a-181l of the general 40 
statutes, (B) any other crime that may be motivated by bigotry or bias as 41 
a result of the actual or perceived race, religion, ethnicity, disability, sex, 42 
sexual orientation or gender identity or expression of another person, 43 
and (C) any criminal activity by an extremist or extremist group.  44 
(c) Not later than October 1, 2021, and annually thereafter, the unit 45 
shall publish a report on the department's Internet web site regarding 46 
the data compiled pursuant to subparagraphs (A) and (B) of subdivision 47 
(2) of subsection (b) of this section. 48  Substitute Bill No. 122 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00122-
R02-SB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
Sec. 3. Section 29-7m of the general statutes is repealed and the 49 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 50 
(a) [On and after July 1, 1988, the] The Hate Crimes and Extremist 51 
Group Investigative Unit of the Division of State Police within the 52 
Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection shall monitor, 53 
record and classify all crimes committed in the state which are 54 
motivated by bigotry or bias. 55 
[(b) The police department, resident state trooper or constable who 56 
performs law enforcement duties for each town shall monitor, record 57 
and classify all crimes committed within such town which are violations 58 
of section 53a-181j, 53a-181k or 53a-181l and report such information to 59 
the Division of State Police within the Department of Emergency 60 
Services and Public Protection.] 61 
(b) Any law enforcement unit, as defined in section 7-294a, shall submit 62 
a report to the Hate Crimes and Extremist Group Investigative Unit, not 63 
later than fourteen days after receiving notification, information or a 64 
complaint of (1) any alleged crime that is a violation of section 53a-181j, 65 
53a-181k or 53a-181l, (2) any other alleged crime that may be motivated 66 
by bigotry or bias as a result of the actual or perceived race, religion, 67 
ethnicity, disability, sex, sexual orientation or gender identity or 68 
expression of another person, and (3) any suspected criminal activity by 69 
an extremist or extremist group, as such terms are defined in subsection 70 
(a) of section 2 of this act. 71 
(c) Not later than January 1, 2022, and biannually thereafter, the 72 
Police Officer Standards and Training Council, in consultation with the 73 
Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection, shall (1) 74 
develop and promulgate a standardized form to be used by a law 75 
enforcement unit to submit a report pursuant to subsection (b) of this 76 
section, (2) develop best practices to facilitate the sharing of information 77 
among and between the Hate Crimes and Extremist Group Investigative 78 
Unit and law enforcements units, and (3) take such actions, as the 79 
council and commissioner deem appropriate, to inform the public of its 80  Substitute Bill No. 122 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00122-
R02-SB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
right to report any alleged crime or suspected criminal activity as 81 
described in subdivisions (1) to (3), inclusive, of subsection (b) of this 82 
section and how to make such reports.83 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 29-4(d) 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 New section 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 29-7m 
 
Statement of Legislative Commissioners:   
In Section 2(b), "fulfill the duties of this section. The unit shall" was 
added for clarity. 
 
PS Joint Favorable Subst.