Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00122 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/06/2021

                     
Researcher: GM 	Page 1 	4/6/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 122  
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A UNIT WITHIN THE DIVISION OF STATE 
POLICE TO INVESTIGATE HATE CRIMES AND CRIMINAL ACTS 
COMMITTED BY EXTREMIST GROUPS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Emergency Services and Public 
Protection (DESPP) commissioner to establish, within the State Police, 
a Hate Crimes and Extremist Group Investigative Unit (hereinafter, 
“Hate Crimes and Extremist Unit”). Under the bill, the head of this 
unit must (1) have the rank of sergeant or above and (2) serve, or 
appoint a designee to serve, as a liaison to the State-Wide Hate Crimes 
Advisory Council (see BACKGROUND). 
The bill transfers the responsibility for monitoring, recording, and 
classifying all crimes committed in the state that are motivated by 
bigotry or bias from the State Police to the Hate Crimes and Extremist 
Unit. The bill also modifies related reporting requirements by other 
law enforcement. 
Under current law, town police departments, resident state 
troopers, and constables performing law enforcement duties must 
monitor, record, and classify certain specific crimes involving 
intimidation based on bigotry or bias (see BACKGROUND) that are 
committed in their towns and report them to the State Police. The bill 
eliminates these requirements and instead requires all law enforcement 
units (see BACKGROUND) to submit a report to the Hate Crimes and 
Extremist Unit within 14 days after receiving notification, information, 
or a complaint of any: 
1. alleged crime that is a violation of the specific crimes involving 
intimidation based on bigotry or bias; 
2. other alleged crime that may be motivated by bigotry or bias  2021SB-00122-R000276-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 2 	4/6/21 
 
because of someone’s actual or perceived race, religion, 
ethnicity, disability, sex, sexual orientation, or gender identity 
or expression; and 
3. suspected criminal activity by an extremist or extremist group 
(see below). 
Relatedly, the Hate Crimes and Extremist Unit must (1) prevent, 
investigate, and detect those crimes and criminal activities, (2) assist 
law enforcement units with the investigation of the same, and (3) 
compile, maintain, and analyze data regarding the same that were, 
presumably, charged as crimes. Starting by October 1, 2021, the unit 
must annually publish a report on DESPP’s website regarding the data 
it compiles on the charged crimes relating to bigotry or bias. The bill 
requires the DESPP commissioner to assign enough personnel to the 
unit to fulfill these duties. 
Lastly, the bill requires the Police Officer Standards and Training 
Council, in consultation with the DESPP commissioner, to: 
1. develop and promulgate a standardized form for law 
enforcement units for reporting on the notifications, 
information, and complaints they receive on the above crimes 
and criminal activities; 
2. develop best practices to facilitate information sharing between 
the Hate Crimes and Extremist Unit and law enforcement units; 
and 
3. take actions they deem appropriate to inform the public on how 
to make reports of those crimes and criminal activities. 
Under the bill, these actions must be done by January 1, 2022, and 
twice a year after that. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021  
EXTREMIST AND EXTREM IST GROUP DEFINITIONS 
Under the bill, an “extremist” is an individual encouraging, 
condoning, justifying, or supporting the actual or attempted  2021SB-00122-R000276-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 3 	4/6/21 
 
commission of certain crimes to achieve a political, ideological, 
religious, social, or economic goal. Specifically, this applies to violent 
crimes or crimes intended to cause (1) another person physical harm or 
(2) property damage. Additionally, an “extremist group” is a group of 
extremists associated in fact but not a legal entity. 
BACKGROUND 
State-Wide Hate Crimes Advisory Council 
By law, this council is responsible for making annual 
recommendations for legislation concerning hate crimes to the 
Judiciary and Public Safety committees. Additionally, the council must 
meet at least twice a year to encourage and coordinate programs to 
increase community awareness, reporting, and combating of hate 
crimes. The council is within the Office of the Chief State’s Attorney for 
administrative purposes only (CGS § 51-279f). 
Intimidation Based on Bigotry or Bias Crimes 
By law, it is a crime to commit certain actions or make certain 
threats with the intent to intimidate or harass another person because 
of his or her actual or perceived race, religion, ethnicity, disability, sex, 
sexual orientation, or gender identity or expression. The law provides 
three degrees of penalties for this crime that vary depending on the 
actions of the intimidator or harasser (CGS §§ 53a-181j, -181k & -181l).  
Law Enforcement Units 
By law, “law enforcement unit” is any state or municipal agency or 
department (or tribal agency or department created and governed 
under a memorandum of agreement) whose primary functions include 
enforcing criminal or traffic laws; preserving public order; protecting 
life and property; or preventing, detecting, or investigating crime (CGS 
§ 7-294a). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Safety and Security Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 22 Nay 3 (03/18/2021)