Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00127 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 7, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021
Bill January 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021