Senate | 06/14/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | Public Act 21-38 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | House Calendar Number 433 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | File Number 314 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 204 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |