Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00262 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 4, 2021
Bill January 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021
Analysis March 4, 2021