Senate | 03/25/2021 | File Number 140 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 134 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Public Hearing 02/04 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |