Senate | 03/04/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Vote to Draft |