Senate | 05/21/2021 | House Calendar Number 524 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | File Number 99 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 112 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |