Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00416 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 9, 2021
Bill January 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis July 30, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021
Analysis March 9, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2021