Senate | 04/28/2021 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | File Number 60 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 72 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Vote to Draft |