Senate | 06/09/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | File Number 555 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 333 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |