Senate | 06/09/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | File Number 444 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 282 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |