Senate | 03/31/2021 | File Number 232 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 171 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/05/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Vote to Draft |