Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2021
|
Public Act 21-107
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House Calendar Number 556
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9334
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
File Number 446
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 268
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|