Senate | 06/09/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | File Number 61 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 73 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Public Hearing 02/03 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |