LCO \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00764-R01- SB.docx 1 of 4 General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 764 January Session, 2021 AN ACT CONCERNING ME DICAID PROVIDERS. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. Section 17b-28e of the general statutes is amended by 1 adding subsection (d) as follows (Effective from passage): 2 (NEW) (d) Not later than October 1, 2021, the Commissioner of Social 3 Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include services 4 provided by acupuncturists licensed pursuant to section 20-206bb and 5 chiropractors licensed pursuant to section 20-27 as optional services 6 under the Medicaid program. 7 Sec. 2. Section 17b-280c of the general statutes is repealed and the 8 following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 9 (a) For purposes of this section: (1) "Methadone maintenance" means 10 a chemical maintenance program under which an addiction to one drug, 11 including, but not limited to, heroin, is treated with the drug methadone 12 in a weekly program that includes on and off-site methadone 13 administration, drug testing and counseling; and (2) "chemical 14 maintenance provider" means a provider certified and licensed by the 15 federal Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration 16 and the state Department of Public Health who meets all federal and 17 state requirements, including, but not limited to, requirements specific 18 to the provision of chemical maintenance services. 19 Substitute Bill No. 764 LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00764- R01-SB.docx } 2 of 4 (b) The Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid 20 state plan to provide a minimum weekly reimbursement rate of eighty-21 eight dollars and fifty-two cents to a chemical maintenance provider for 22 methadone maintenance treatment of a Medicaid beneficiary, provided 23 no such provider receiving a higher rate shall have such rate reduced to 24 the minimum as a result of the implementation of a new minimum 25 reimbursement rate. 26 [(c) Notwithstanding subsection (b) of this section, on or after July 1, 27 2020, any reimbursement to a chemical maintenance provider for 28 methadone maintenance treatment shall be contingent upon meeting 29 certain performance measures as determined by the commissioner. Such 30 performance measures shall be developed in consultation with the 31 Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services and chemical 32 maintenance providers. Initial performance measures shall be 33 developed by September 30, 2019, including the means by which such 34 measures shall be evaluated. The initial evaluation period shall be based 35 on the claims data for the quarter ending March 31, 2020. The 36 performance measures and thresholds may be adjusted after the initial 37 evaluation period. Failure to meet department-identified standards on 38 performance measures shall result in a rate reduction of (1) up to five 39 per cent for the quarters ending September 30, 2020, and December 31, 40 2020, and (2) up to ten per cent beginning January 1, 2021. No provider 41 shall receive a rate decrease under this subsection that is more than a ten 42 per cent decrease annually.] 43 [(d)] (c) The Commissioner of Social Services, pursuant to section 17b-44 10, may implement policies and procedures to administer the provisions 45 of this section while in the process of adopting such policies and 46 procedures in regulation form, provided the commissioner [prints] 47 posts notice of the intent to adopt the regulations on the department's 48 Internet web site and the eRegulations System not later than twenty 49 days after the date of implementation. Such policies and procedures 50 shall be valid until the time final regulations are adopted. 51 Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective from passage) The Commissioner of Social 52 Substitute Bill No. 764 LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00764- R01-SB.docx } 3 of 4 Services shall adjust rates of reimbursement under the Medicaid 53 program so that (1) a nurse-midwife licensed pursuant to chapter 377 of 54 the general statutes receives the same rate as an obstetrician-55 gynecologist licensed pursuant to chapter 370 of the general statutes for 56 performing the same medical service or procedure, and (2) a podiatrist 57 licensed pursuant to chapter 375 of the general statutes receives the 58 same rate as a physician licensed pursuant to chapter 370 of the general 59 statutes for performing the same medical service or procedure. The 60 commissioner shall seek federal approval to amend the Medicaid state 61 plan, if necessary, to adjust rates of reimbursement in accordance with 62 this section. 63 Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) The Commissioner of Social 64 Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to integrate services 65 provided by peer support specialists into care teams funded under the 66 medical assistance program and provide Medicaid reimbursement to 67 such specialists for such services. For purposes of this section, "peer 68 support services" means a recovery-focused behavioral health service 69 that allows an individual the opportunity to learn to manage his or her 70 recovery with help from a peer support specialist who may have 71 experience recovering from mental illness or substance use disorder.72 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 from passage 17b-28e Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 17b-280c Sec. 3 from passage New section Sec. 4 July 1, 2021 New section Statement of Legislative Commissioners: In Section 4, " into the medical assistance program and provide Medicaid reimbursement for such services" was changed to "into care teams funded under the medical assistance program and provide Medicaid reimbursement to such specialists for such services" for clarity. Substitute Bill No. 764 LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00764- R01-SB.docx } 4 of 4 HS Joint Favorable Subst. -LCO