6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 764 |
---|
8 | 8 | | January Session, 2021 |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | AN ACT CONCERNING ME DICAID PROVIDERS. |
---|
13 | 13 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
14 | 14 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | Section 1. Section 17b-28e of the general statutes is amended by 1 |
---|
17 | 17 | | adding subsection (d) as follows (Effective from passage): 2 |
---|
18 | 18 | | (NEW) (d) Not later than October 1, 2021, the Commissioner of Social 3 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include services 4 |
---|
20 | 20 | | provided by acupuncturists licensed pursuant to section 20-206bb and 5 |
---|
21 | 21 | | chiropractors licensed pursuant to section 20-27 as optional services 6 |
---|
22 | 22 | | under the Medicaid program. 7 |
---|
23 | 23 | | Sec. 2. Section 17b-280c of the general statutes is repealed and the 8 |
---|
24 | 24 | | following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 9 |
---|
25 | 25 | | (a) For purposes of this section: (1) "Methadone maintenance" means 10 |
---|
26 | 26 | | a chemical maintenance program under which an addiction to one drug, 11 |
---|
27 | 27 | | including, but not limited to, heroin, is treated with the drug methadone 12 |
---|
28 | 28 | | in a weekly program that includes on and off-site methadone 13 |
---|
29 | 29 | | administration, drug testing and counseling; and (2) "chemical 14 |
---|
30 | 30 | | maintenance provider" means a provider certified and licensed by the 15 |
---|
31 | 31 | | federal Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration 16 |
---|
32 | 32 | | and the state Department of Public Health who meets all federal and 17 |
---|
33 | 33 | | state requirements, including, but not limited to, requirements specific 18 |
---|
34 | 34 | | to the provision of chemical maintenance services. 19 Substitute Bill No. 764 |
---|
35 | 35 | | |
---|
36 | 36 | | |
---|
37 | 37 | | LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00764- |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | (b) The Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid 20 |
---|
42 | 42 | | state plan to provide a minimum weekly reimbursement rate of eighty-21 |
---|
43 | 43 | | eight dollars and fifty-two cents to a chemical maintenance provider for 22 |
---|
44 | 44 | | methadone maintenance treatment of a Medicaid beneficiary, provided 23 |
---|
45 | 45 | | no such provider receiving a higher rate shall have such rate reduced to 24 |
---|
46 | 46 | | the minimum as a result of the implementation of a new minimum 25 |
---|
47 | 47 | | reimbursement rate. 26 |
---|
48 | 48 | | [(c) Notwithstanding subsection (b) of this section, on or after July 1, 27 |
---|
49 | 49 | | 2020, any reimbursement to a chemical maintenance provider for 28 |
---|
50 | 50 | | methadone maintenance treatment shall be contingent upon meeting 29 |
---|
51 | 51 | | certain performance measures as determined by the commissioner. Such 30 |
---|
52 | 52 | | performance measures shall be developed in consultation with the 31 |
---|
53 | 53 | | Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services and chemical 32 |
---|
54 | 54 | | maintenance providers. Initial performance measures shall be 33 |
---|
55 | 55 | | developed by September 30, 2019, including the means by which such 34 |
---|
56 | 56 | | measures shall be evaluated. The initial evaluation period shall be based 35 |
---|
57 | 57 | | on the claims data for the quarter ending March 31, 2020. The 36 |
---|
58 | 58 | | performance measures and thresholds may be adjusted after the initial 37 |
---|
59 | 59 | | evaluation period. Failure to meet department-identified standards on 38 |
---|
60 | 60 | | performance measures shall result in a rate reduction of (1) up to five 39 |
---|
61 | 61 | | per cent for the quarters ending September 30, 2020, and December 31, 40 |
---|
62 | 62 | | 2020, and (2) up to ten per cent beginning January 1, 2021. No provider 41 |
---|
63 | 63 | | shall receive a rate decrease under this subsection that is more than a ten 42 |
---|
64 | 64 | | per cent decrease annually.] 43 |
---|
65 | 65 | | [(d)] (c) The Commissioner of Social Services, pursuant to section 17b-44 |
---|
66 | 66 | | 10, may implement policies and procedures to administer the provisions 45 |
---|
67 | 67 | | of this section while in the process of adopting such policies and 46 |
---|
68 | 68 | | procedures in regulation form, provided the commissioner [prints] 47 |
---|
69 | 69 | | posts notice of the intent to adopt the regulations on the department's 48 |
---|
70 | 70 | | Internet web site and the eRegulations System not later than twenty 49 |
---|
71 | 71 | | days after the date of implementation. Such policies and procedures 50 |
---|
72 | 72 | | shall be valid until the time final regulations are adopted. 51 |
---|
73 | 73 | | Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective from passage) The Commissioner of Social 52 Substitute Bill No. 764 |
---|
74 | 74 | | |
---|
75 | 75 | | |
---|
76 | 76 | | LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00764- |
---|
79 | 79 | | |
---|
80 | 80 | | Services shall adjust rates of reimbursement under the Medicaid 53 |
---|
81 | 81 | | program so that (1) a nurse-midwife licensed pursuant to chapter 377 of 54 |
---|
82 | 82 | | the general statutes receives the same rate as an obstetrician-55 |
---|
83 | 83 | | gynecologist licensed pursuant to chapter 370 of the general statutes for 56 |
---|
84 | 84 | | performing the same medical service or procedure, and (2) a podiatrist 57 |
---|
85 | 85 | | licensed pursuant to chapter 375 of the general statutes receives the 58 |
---|
86 | 86 | | same rate as a physician licensed pursuant to chapter 370 of the general 59 |
---|
87 | 87 | | statutes for performing the same medical service or procedure. The 60 |
---|
88 | 88 | | commissioner shall seek federal approval to amend the Medicaid state 61 |
---|
89 | 89 | | plan, if necessary, to adjust rates of reimbursement in accordance with 62 |
---|
90 | 90 | | this section. 63 |
---|
91 | 91 | | Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) The Commissioner of Social 64 |
---|
92 | 92 | | Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to integrate services 65 |
---|
93 | 93 | | provided by peer support specialists into care teams funded under the 66 |
---|
94 | 94 | | medical assistance program and provide Medicaid reimbursement to 67 |
---|
95 | 95 | | such specialists for such services. For purposes of this section, "peer 68 |
---|
96 | 96 | | support services" means a recovery-focused behavioral health service 69 |
---|
97 | 97 | | that allows an individual the opportunity to learn to manage his or her 70 |
---|
98 | 98 | | recovery with help from a peer support specialist who may have 71 |
---|
99 | 99 | | experience recovering from mental illness or substance use disorder.72 |
---|
100 | 100 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
101 | 101 | | sections: |
---|
102 | 102 | | |
---|
103 | 103 | | Section 1 from passage 17b-28e |
---|
104 | 104 | | Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 17b-280c |
---|
105 | 105 | | Sec. 3 from passage New section |
---|
106 | 106 | | Sec. 4 July 1, 2021 New section |
---|
107 | 107 | | |
---|