Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00764 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/05/2021

                     
 
LCO   \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00764-R02-
SB.docx  
1 of 3 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 764  
January Session, 2021 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ME DICAID PROVIDERS.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 17b-28e of the general statutes is amended by 1 
adding subsection (d) as follows (Effective from passage): 2 
(NEW) (d) Not later than October 1, 2021, the Commissioner of Social 3 
Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include services 4 
provided by acupuncturists licensed pursuant to section 20-206bb and 5 
chiropractors licensed pursuant to section 20-27 as optional services 6 
under the Medicaid program. 7 
Sec. 2. Section 17b-280c of the general statutes is repealed and the 8 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 9 
(a) For purposes of this section: (1) "Methadone maintenance" means 10 
a chemical maintenance program under which an addiction to one drug, 11 
including, but not limited to, heroin, is treated with the drug methadone 12 
in a weekly program that includes on and off-site methadone 13 
administration, drug testing and counseling; and (2) "chemical 14 
maintenance provider" means a provider certified and licensed by the 15 
federal Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration 16 
and the state Department of Public Health who meets all federal and 17 
state requirements, including, but not limited to, requirements specific 18 
to the provision of chemical maintenance services. 19  Substitute Bill No. 764 
 
 
LCO   {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00764-
R02-SB.docx }   
2 of 3 
 
(b) The Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid 20 
state plan to provide a minimum weekly reimbursement rate of eighty-21 
eight dollars and fifty-two cents to a chemical maintenance provider for 22 
methadone maintenance treatment of a Medicaid beneficiary, provided 23 
no such provider receiving a higher rate shall have such rate reduced to 24 
the minimum as a result of the implementation of a new minimum 25 
reimbursement rate. 26 
[(c) Notwithstanding subsection (b) of this section, on or after July 1, 27 
2020, any reimbursement to a chemical maintenance provider for 28 
methadone maintenance treatment shall be contingent upon meeting 29 
certain performance measures as determined by the commissioner. Such 30 
performance measures shall be developed in consultation with the 31 
Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services and chemical 32 
maintenance providers. Initial performance measures shall be 33 
developed by September 30, 2019, including the means by which such 34 
measures shall be evaluated. The initial evaluation period shall be based 35 
on the claims data for the quarter ending March 31, 2020. The 36 
performance measures and thresholds may be adjusted after the initial 37 
evaluation period. Failure to meet department-identified standards on 38 
performance measures shall result in a rate reduction of (1) up to five 39 
per cent for the quarters ending September 30, 2020, and December 31, 40 
2020, and (2) up to ten per cent beginning January 1, 2021. No provider 41 
shall receive a rate decrease under this subsection that is more than a ten 42 
per cent decrease annually.] 43 
[(d)] (c) The Commissioner of Social Services, pursuant to section 17b-44 
10, may implement policies and procedures to administer the provisions 45 
of this section while in the process of adopting such policies and 46 
procedures in regulation form, provided the commissioner [prints] 47 
posts notice of the intent to adopt the regulations on the department's 48 
Internet web site and the eRegulations System not later than twenty 49 
days after the date of implementation. Such policies and procedures 50 
shall be valid until the time final regulations are adopted. 51 
Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective from passage) The Commissioner of Social 52  Substitute Bill No. 764 
 
 
LCO   {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00764-
R02-SB.docx }   
3 of 3 
 
Services shall adjust rates of reimbursement under the Medicaid 53 
program so that (1) a nurse-midwife licensed pursuant to chapter 377 of 54 
the general statutes receives the same rate as an obstetrician-55 
gynecologist licensed pursuant to chapter 370 of the general statutes for 56 
performing the same medical service or procedure, and (2) a podiatrist 57 
licensed pursuant to chapter 375 of the general statutes receives the 58 
same rate as a physician licensed pursuant to chapter 370 of the general 59 
statutes for performing the same medical service or procedure. The 60 
commissioner shall seek federal approval to amend the Medicaid state 61 
plan, if necessary, to adjust rates of reimbursement in accordance with 62 
this section. 63 
Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) The Commissioner of Social 64 
Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to integrate services 65 
provided by peer support specialists into care teams funded under the 66 
medical assistance program and provide Medicaid reimbursement to 67 
such specialists for such services. For purposes of this section, "peer 68 
support services" means a recovery-focused behavioral health service 69 
that allows an individual the opportunity to learn to manage his or her 70 
recovery with help from a peer support specialist who may have 71 
experience recovering from mental illness or substance use disorder.72 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage 17b-28e 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 17b-280c 
Sec. 3 from passage New section 
Sec. 4 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
 
HS Joint Favorable Subst. -LCO  
APP Joint Favorable