Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00764 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/23/2021

                     
Researcher: MF 	Page 1 	3/23/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 764  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING MEDICAID PROVIDERS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Social Services (DSS) to make 
changes under the state’s Medicaid program affecting various types of 
providers.  
It requires the DSS commissioner to amend the Medicaid state plan 
by October 1, 2021, to include services provided by licensed 
acupuncturists and licensed chiropractors as covered Medicaid 
services. It also requires her to adjust Medicaid reimbursement rates so 
that (1) licensed nurse-midwifes receive the same rates as licensed 
obstetrician-gynecologists for performing the same services or 
procedures and (2) licensed podiatrists receive the same rates as 
licensed physicians for performing the same services or procedures. 
The commissioner must seek federal approval to amend the Medicaid 
state plan, if needed, to adjust the reimbursement rates for the nurse-
midwifes and podiatrists. 
Under the bill, the DSS commissioner must amend the Medicaid 
state plan to integrate services provided by peer support specialists 
into care teams funded under the medical assistance program and 
provide Medicaid reimbursement for these services. Under the bill, 
peer support service is a recovery-focused behavioral health service 
that allows an individual the opportunity to learn to manage his or her 
recovery with help from a peer support specialist who may have 
experience recovering from mental illness or substance use disorder. 
 The bill eliminates a provision under current law requiring 
Medicaid payments for methadone maintenance to be contingent on 
providers meeting certain performance measures. Under current law, 
failure to meet department-identified standards on performance  2021SB-00764-R000109-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 2 	3/23/21 
 
measures results in 5% rate reductions for the second half of 2020 and 
10% rate reductions beginning January 1, 2021.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage, except provisions on methadone 
maintenance and peer support specialists are effective July 1, 2021. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Human Services Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 14 Nay 5 (03/09/2021)