Senate | 02/24/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Public Hearing 02/09 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |