Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00815 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44 LCO No. 1707 1 of 4
55
66 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 815
77 January Session, 2021
88 LCO No. 1707
99
1010
1111 Referred to Committee on AGING
1212
1313
1414 Introduced by:
1515 (AGE)
1616
1717
1818
1919
2020 AN ACT CONCERNING SM OKING IN NURSING HOM ES, ASSISTED
2121 LIVING FACILITIES AND OTHER HOUSING FOR THE ELDE RLY.
2222 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
2323 Assembly convened:
2424
2525 Section 1. Section 19a-342 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1
2626 following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2021): 2
2727 (a) As used in this section, "smoke" or "smoking" means the lighting 3
2828 or carrying of a lighted cigarette, cigar, pipe or similar device. 4
2929 (b) (1) Notwithstanding the provisions of section 31-40q, no person 5
3030 shall smoke: (A) In any building or portion of a building, partially 6
3131 enclosed shelter on a rail platform or bus shelter owned and operated 7
3232 or leased and operated by the state or any political subdivision thereof; 8
3333 (B) in any area of a health care institution, including, but not limited to, 9
3434 a nursing home facility as defined in section 19a-490; (C) in any area of 10
3535 a retail food store; (D) in any restaurant; (E) in any area of an 11
3636 establishment with a permit issued for the sale of alcoholic liquor 12
3737 pursuant to section 30-20a, 30-21, 30-21b, 30-22, 30-22c, 30-28, 30-28a, 30-13
3838 33a, 30-33b, 30-35a, 30-37a, 30-37e or 30-37f, in any area of an 14
3939 establishment with a permit for the sale of alcoholic liquor pursuant to 15 Raised Bill No. 815
4040
4141
4242
4343 LCO No. 1707 2 of 4
4444
4545 section 30-23 issued after May 1, 2003, and, on and after April 1, 2004, in 16
4646 any area of an establishment with a permit issued for the sale of 17
4747 alcoholic liquor pursuant to section 30-22a or 30-26 or the bar area of a 18
4848 bowling establishment holding a permit pursuant to subsection (a) of 19
4949 section 30-37c; (F) within a school building or on the grounds of such 20
5050 school; (G) within a child care facility or on the grounds of such child 21
5151 care facility, except, if the child care facility is a family child care home, 22
5252 as defined in section 19a-77, such smoking is prohibited only when a 23
5353 child enrolled in such home is present; (H) in any passenger elevator, 24
5454 provided no person shall be arrested for violating this subsection unless 25
5555 there is posted in such elevator a sign which indicates that smoking is 26
5656 prohibited by state law; (I) in any dormitory in any public or private 27
5757 institution of higher education; [or] (J) on and after April 1, 2004, in any 28
5858 area of a dog race track or a facility equipped with screens for the 29
5959 simulcasting of off-track betting race programs or jai alai games; (K) in 30
6060 any public housing unit where smoking is not permitted pursuant to 24 31
6161 CFR 965.653, as amended from time to time; or (L) in common areas or 32
6262 within twenty-five feet of entrances or exits of public housing for elderly 33
6363 persons, including assisted living facilities, designated pursuant to 34
6464 chapter 128 and not otherwise subject to regulation under 24 CFR 35
6565 965.653, as amended from time to time. For purposes of this subsection, 36
6666 "restaurant" means space, in a suitable and permanent building, kept, 37
6767 used, maintained, advertised and held out to the public to be a place 38
6868 where meals are regularly served to the public, "school" has the same 39
6969 meaning as provided in section 10-154a and "child care facility" has the 40
7070 same meaning as provided in section 19a-342a. 41
7171 (2) This section shall not apply to (A) correctional facilities; (B) 42
7272 designated smoking areas in psychiatric facilities; (C) public housing 43
7373 projects, as defined in subsection (b) of section 21a-278a, except for those 44
7474 where smoking is not permitted pursuant to 24 CFR 965.653, as 45
7575 amended from time; (D) any classroom where demonstration smoking 46
7676 is taking place as part of a medical or scientific experiment or lesson; (E) 47
7777 smoking rooms provided by employers for employees, pursuant to 48
7878 section 31-40q; (F) notwithstanding the provisions of subparagraph (E) 49 Raised Bill No. 815
7979
8080
8181
8282 LCO No. 1707 3 of 4
8383
8484 of subdivision (1) of this subsection, the outdoor portion of the premises 50
8585 of any permittee listed in subparagraph (E) of subdivision (1) of this 51
8686 subsection, provided, in the case of any seating area maintained for the 52
8787 service of food, at least seventy-five per cent of the outdoor seating 53
8888 capacity is an area in which smoking is prohibited and which is clearly 54
8989 designated with written signage as a nonsmoking area, except that any 55
9090 temporary seating area established for special events and not used on a 56
9191 regular basis shall not be subject to the smoking prohibition or signage 57
9292 requirements of this subparagraph; (G) any medical research site where 58
9393 smoking is integral to the research being conducted; or (H) any tobacco 59
9494 bar, provided no tobacco bar shall expand in size or change its location 60
9595 from its size or location as of December 31, 2002. For purposes of this 61
9696 subdivision, "outdoor" means an area which has no roof or other ceiling 62
9797 enclosure, "tobacco bar" means an establishment with a permit for the 63
9898 sale of alcoholic liquor to consumers issued pursuant to chapter 545 that, 64
9999 in the calendar year ending December 31, 2002, generated ten per cent 65
100100 or more of its total annual gross income from the on-site sale of tobacco 66
101101 products and the rental of on-site humidors, and "tobacco product" 67
102102 means any substance that contains tobacco, including, but not limited 68
103103 to, cigarettes, cigars, pipe tobacco or chewing tobacco. 69
104104 (c) The operator of a hotel, motel or similar lodging may allow guests 70
105105 to smoke in not more than twenty-five per cent of the rooms offered as 71
106106 accommodations to guests. 72
107107 (d) In each room, elevator, area or building in which smoking is 73
108108 prohibited by this section, the person in control of the premises shall 74
109109 post or cause to be posted in a conspicuous place signs stating that 75
110110 smoking is prohibited by state law. Such signs, except in elevators, 76
111111 restaurants, establishments with permits to sell alcoholic liquor to 77
112112 consumers issued pursuant to chapter 545, hotels, motels or similar 78
113113 lodgings, and health care institutions, shall have letters at least four 79
114114 inches high with the principal strokes of letters not less than one-half 80
115115 inch wide. 81
116116 (e) Any person found guilty of smoking in violation of this section, 82 Raised Bill No. 815
117117
118118
119119
120120 LCO No. 1707 4 of 4
121121
122122 failure to post signs as required by this section or the unauthorized 83
123123 removal of such signs shall have committed an infraction. Nothing in 84
124124 this section shall be construed to require the person in control of a 85
125125 building to post such signs in every room of a building, provided such 86
126126 signs are posted in a conspicuous place in such building. 87
127127 (f) Nothing in this section shall be construed to require any smoking 88
128128 area in any building. 89
129129 (g) The provisions of this section shall supersede and preempt the 90
130130 provisions of any municipal law or ordinance relative to smoking 91
131131 effective prior to, on or after October 1, 1993. 92
132132 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
133133 sections:
134134
135135 Section 1 October 1, 2021 19a-342
136136
137137 Statement of Purpose:
138138 To protect the health of elderly persons by restricting cigarette smoking.
139139 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except
140140 that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not
141141 underlined.]
142142