Senate | 04/22/2021 | File Number 590 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 339 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/16/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Public Hearing 03/26 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Vote to Draft |