Senate | 06/09/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | File Number 449 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 280 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/12/2021 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |