Senate | 05/26/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | File Number 640 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 397 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | Public Hearing 02/09 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |