Senate | 04/28/2021 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | File Number 233 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 172 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |