Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00862 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/09/2021

                                
 
 
 
LCO No. 3152  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 862  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 3152 
 
 
Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(ET)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT LIMITING ELIGIBILITY FOR THE RESIDENTIAL SOLAR 
INVESTMENT PROGRAM A ND PREVENTING DISTRIBUT ED ENERGY 
GENERATION SOLICITAT IONS FROM SEGREGATIN G LARGE 
PROJECTS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (f) of section 16-245gg of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2 
2021): 3 
(f) The purchase price of solar home renewable energy credits shall 4 
be determined by the Connecticut Green Bank, and such purchase price 5 
shall decline over time commensurate with the schedule of declining 6 
performance-based incentives and expected performance -based 7 
buydowns. Such purchase price shall not exceed the lesser of either (1) 8 
the price of small zero-emission renewable energy credit projects for the 9 
preceding year, or (2) five dollars less per renewable energy credit than 10 
the alternative compliance payment pursuant to subsection (k) of 11 
section 16-245. Any solar project located on a property that contains or 12 
will contain any residence of a customer of an electric distribution 13 
company that is determined to meet the Connecticut Green Bank criteria 14  Raised Bill No.  862 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3152   	2 of 4 
 
as a residential dwelling for the residential solar investment program 15 
shall not be eligible for small zero-emission renewable energy credits 16 
pursuant to sections 16-244r, as amended by this act, and 16-244s or for 17 
low-emission renewable energy credits pursuant to section 16-244t. 18 
Whenever there is an exhaustion of funding in the residential solar 19 
investment program, no solar project that meets the Connecticut Green 20 
Bank criteria as a residential dwelling for the residential solar 21 
investment program shall be eligible for small zero-emission renewable 22 
energy credits pursuant to sections 16-244r, as amended by this act, and 23 
16-244s or for low-emission renewable energy credits pursuant to 24 
section 16-244t. 25 
Sec. 2. Subsections (a) and (b) of section 16-244r of the general statutes 26 
are repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 27 
1, 2021): 28 
(a) Commencing on January 1, 2012, and within the period 29 
established in subsection (a) of section 16-244s, each electric distribution 30 
company shall solicit and file with the Public Utilities Regulatory 31 
Authority for its approval one or more long-term contracts with owners 32 
or developers of Class I generation projects that emit no pollutants and 33 
that are less than one thousand kilowatts in size, located on the customer 34 
side of the revenue meter and serve the distribution system of the 35 
electric distribution company. The authority may give a preference to 36 
contracts for technologies manufactured, researched or developed in the 37 
state. On or after July 1, 2021, the project size for any such solicitation 38 
shall be based upon the total megawatts located on a single parcel of 39 
land, or contiguous parcels under common ownership or a common 40 
developer, regardless of metering infrastructure. No project may 41 
subdivide parcels of land for the purpose of meeting the project size 42 
requirements in this section. 43 
(b) Solicitations conducted by the electric distribution company shall 44 
be for the purchase of renewable energy credits produced by eligible 45 
customer-sited generating projects over the duration of the long-term 46 
contract. For purposes of this section, a long-term contract is a contract 47  Raised Bill No.  862 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3152   	3 of 4 
 
for fifteen years. On or after July 1, 2021, in conducting any such 48 
solicitation, each electric distribution company shall consult with the 49 
Department of Energy and Environmental Protection to impose 50 
reasonable siting restrictions consistent with the policy goals outlined in 51 
sections 22a-1, 22a-1a and 22a-422. 52 
Sec. 3. Subparagraph (A) of subdivision (1) of subsection (a) of section 53 
16-244z of the general statutes is repealed and the following is 54 
substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 55 
(a) (1) (A) On or before September 1, 2018, the Public Utilities 56 
Regulatory Authority shall initiate a proceeding to establish a 57 
procurement plan for each electric distribution company pursuant to 58 
this subsection and may give a preference to technologies 59 
manufactured, researched or developed in the state, provided such 60 
procurement plan is consistent with and contributes to the requirements 61 
to reduce greenhouse gas emissions in accordance with section 22a-62 
200a. Each electric distribution company shall develop such 63 
procurement plan in consultation with the Department of Energy and 64 
Environmental Protection and shall submit such procurement plan to 65 
the authority not later than sixty days after the authority initiates the 66 
proceeding pursuant to this subdivision, provided the department shall 67 
submit the program requirements pursuant to subparagraph (C) of this 68 
subdivision on or before July 1, 2019. The authority may require such 69 
electric distribution companies to conduct separate solicitations 70 
pursuant to subdivision (4) of this subsection for the resources in 71 
subparagraphs (A), (B) and (C) of said subdivision, including separate 72 
solicitations based upon the size of such resources to allow for a 73 
diversity of selected projects. On or after July 1, 2021, the project size for 74 
any such solicitation shall be based upon the total megawatts located on 75 
a single parcel of land, or contiguous parcels under common ownership 76 
or a common developer, regardless of metering infrastructure. No 77 
project may subdivide parcels of land for the purpose of meeting the 78 
project size requirements in this section. On or after July 1, 2021, in 79 
conducting any such solicitation, each electric distribution company 80 
shall consult with the Department of Energy and Environmental 81  Raised Bill No.  862 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3152   	4 of 4 
 
Protection to impose reasonable siting restrictions consistent with the 82 
policy goals outlined in sections 22a-1, 22a-1a and 22a-422. 83 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 16-245gg(f) 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 16-244r(a) and (b) 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 16-244z(a)(1)(A) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To limit eligibility for the Residential Solar Investment Program, and to 
prevent renewable energy solicitations from segregating a large project 
into smaller projects. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]