Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00869 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/17/2021

                             
 
LCO 2946  \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00869-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 5 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 869  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 2946 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND 
DEVELOPMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PD)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING CO MMUNITY INVESTMENT B OARDS AND 
NEIGHBORHOOD ASSISTA NCE.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2021) (a) Except as provided in 1 
subsection (b) of this section, in each municipality with a population of 2 
more than sixty thousand, as enumerated in the 2010 federal decennial 3 
census, and having a total area of not more than thirty square miles, the 4 
chief executive officer of such municipality shall establish and appoint 5 
members to one community investment board for each neighborhood in 6 
the municipality. Each community investment board may be comprised 7 
of, but need not be limited to, residents, business owners, religious 8 
leaders, community development corporation representatives and 9 
community group representatives. Such boards shall identify priorities 10 
for the use of municipal revenue sharing grants awarded pursuant to 11 
section 4-66l of the general statutes, as amended by this act, and select 12 
grants for payment in lieu of taxes awarded pursuant to section 12-18c 13 
of the general statutes, as amended by this act. 14  Raised Bill No. 869 
 
 
LCO 2946  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00869-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 5 
 
(b) If any municipality described in subsection (a) of this section has 15 
established a neighborhood revitalization zone for a neighborhood 16 
pursuant to section 7-600 of the general statutes, the chief executive 17 
officer of such municipality shall designate the neighborhood 18 
revitalization zone committee of such neighborhood, as described in 19 
section 7-602 of the general statutes, as the community investment board 20 
for such neighborhood for the purposes of carrying out the provisions 21 
of said subsection. 22 
Sec. 2. Section 4-66l of the general statutes is amended by adding 23 
subsection (j) as follows (Effective October 1, 2024): 24 
(NEW) (j) On and after October 1, 2024, any municipal revenue 25 
sharing grant awarded pursuant to this section to a municipality whose 26 
chief executive officer has established or designated community 27 
investment boards pursuant to section 1 of this act may be expended by 28 
such municipality as follows: (1) Thirty-five per cent of such grant shall 29 
be expended on priorities identified by such community investment 30 
boards, (2) thirty-five per cent of such grant shall be expended on 31 
priorities identified by the legislative body of the municipality, and (3) 32 
thirty per cent of such grant shall be expended on priorities jointly 33 
agreed upon by such community investment boards and the legislative 34 
body of the municipality. 35 
Sec. 3. Section 12-18c of the general statutes is repealed and the 36 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2021): 37 
(a) There is established an account to be known as the "select payment 38 
in lieu of taxes account" which shall be a separate, nonlapsing account 39 
within the General Fund. The account shall contain any moneys 40 
required by law to be deposited in the account. Moneys in the account 41 
shall be expended by the Office of Policy and Management for the 42 
purposes of making select grants to municipalities and districts for 43 
payments in lieu of taxes as provided for in subdivision (1) of subsection 44 
(e) of section 12-18b, subparagraphs (B) and (C) of subdivision (2) of 45 
subsection (e) of section 12-18b, subdivision (3) of subsection (e) of 46  Raised Bill No. 869 
 
 
LCO 2946  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00869-
R01-SB.docx }   
3 of 5 
 
section 12-18b and for any other purpose expressly provided by law. 47 
(b) Any select grant for payment in lieu of taxes awarded to a 48 
municipality whose chief executive officer has established or designated 49 
community investment boards pursuant to section 1 of this act may be 50 
expended by such municipality as provided in subsection (j) of section 51 
4-66l, as amended by this act. 52 
Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) Not later than January 1, 2023, 53 
the Office of Policy and Management shall, within available 54 
appropriations, create and maintain an Internet web site to allow 55 
residents and organizations to submit proposals for solutions to 56 
problems specific to urban areas to the Office of Policy and 57 
Management. 58 
(b) If the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management, or the 59 
secretary's designee, determines that a proposal submitted through the 60 
Internet web site created pursuant to subsection (a) of this subsection is 61 
viable, the secretary shall (1) identify a municipality or neighborhood in 62 
which to establish a pilot program to implement the proposal, (2) 63 
establish the pilot program in such municipality or neighborhood, (3) 64 
monitor the implementation of the pilot program, and (4) assess the 65 
results of the pilot program. 66 
(c) The Office of Policy and Management shall, within available 67 
appropriations, provide a monetary award to each resident or 68 
organization that submits a proposal through the Internet web site 69 
created pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, if the secretary, or the 70 
secretary's designee, determines that a pilot program established to 71 
implement the proposal was successful after assessing the results of the 72 
pilot program pursuant to subsection (b) of this section. 73 
Sec. 5. (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) There is established a task force to 74 
study the (1) programs for which state funding is utilized by nonprofit 75 
providers, and (2) requirements imposed on nonprofit providers by 76 
state agencies and compliance with those requirements by nonprofit 77  Raised Bill No. 869 
 
 
LCO 2946  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00869-
R01-SB.docx }   
4 of 5 
 
providers. 78 
(b) The task force shall consist of the following members: 79 
(1) Two appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives; 80 
(2) Two appointed by the president pro tempore of the Senate; 81 
(3) Two appointed by the majority leader of the House of 82 
Representatives; 83 
(4) Two appointed by the majority leader of the Senate; 84 
(5) Two appointed by the minority leader of the House of 85 
Representatives; and 86 
(6) Two appointed by the minority leader of the Senate. 87 
(c) Any member of the task force appointed under subdivision (1), 88 
(2), (3), (4), (5) or (6) of subsection (b) of this section may be a member 89 
of the General Assembly. 90 
(d) All appointments to the task force shall be made not later than 91 
thirty days after the effective date of this section. Any vacancy shall be 92 
filled by the appointing authority. 93 
(e) The speaker of the House of Representatives and the president pro 94 
tempore of the Senate shall select the chairpersons of the task force from 95 
among the members of the task force. Such chairpersons shall schedule 96 
the first meeting of the task force, which shall be held not later than sixty 97 
days after the effective date of this section. 98 
(f) The administrative staff of the joint standing committee of the 99 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to planning 100 
and development shall serve as administrative staff of the task force. 101 
(g) Not later than January 1, 2022, the task force shall submit a report 102 
on its findings and any recommendations to the joint standing 103  Raised Bill No. 869 
 
 
LCO 2946  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00869-
R01-SB.docx }   
5 of 5 
 
committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 104 
relating to planning and development, in accordance with the 105 
provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. The task force shall 106 
terminate on the date that it submits such report or January 1, 2022, 107 
whichever is later. 108 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2021 New section 
Sec. 2 October 1, 2024 4-66l 
Sec. 3 October 1, 2021 12-18c 
Sec. 4 July 1, 2021 New section 
Sec. 5 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
PD Joint Favorable