Senate | 05/26/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | File Number 100 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 113 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/26/2021 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |