Senate | 05/13/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Public Act 21-8 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Signed by Governor in Original | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | House Calendar Number 445 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | File Number 486 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 290 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |