Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Public Act 21-50
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
House Calendar Number 494
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8319
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
File Number 113
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 122
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|